Multiply by 125

Multiply by 125

68*125=8500

Step 1 :Place three zeros at the end of the number :68000
Step 2: Divide the number from Step 1 by 8:68000/8=8500

64*125 is the same as :
32*250 is the same as
16*500 is the same as
8*1000

64*125

Step 1. Each time you just need to pick 125 multiply it by 8 will get 1000
Step 2. Pick 64 and divide it by 8 will get 8
Step 3. Multiply the results with each other 8* 1000

Hence Solution is 8000
[Hint: Just remember 125*8=1000]

Leave a Reply