# Multiplication of Whole Numbers

Multiplication of whole numbers is the sort way to do repeated addition.

Multiply 2345081 and 4 by expansion method.

**Solution:**

(2000000 + 300000 + 40000 + 5000 + 80 + 1) × 4

= (2000000 × 4) + (300000 × 4) + (40000 × 4) + (5000 × 4) + (80

× 4) + (1 × 4)

= 8000000 + 1200000 + 160000 + 20000 + 320 + 4

= 9380324

The number by which any number is multiplied is known as the

multiplicand. The result of the multiplication is known as the product

Let us recall multiplication of a number by two or three digit number. Now we will learn multiplication of large numbers.

**Note:** Multiplication can also be referred as product.

**1. Multiply 6285 by 289.**

When we multiply 6285 by 289 we know, 6285 is the multiplicand and 289 is the multiplier. First with the multiplicand i.e. 6285 we will multiply by 9 and we get 56565. Then we will multiply 6285 by 8 and we get 50280 and atlast when we will multiply 6285 by 2 and we get 125700.

Therefore, after adding we get 1816365.

**2. Multiply 73162453 by 2435.**

In multiply 73162453 by 2435 we

know, 73162453 is the multiplicand and 2435 is the multiplier.

First

with the multiplicand i.e. 73162453 we will multiply by 5 and we get

365812265. Then we will multiply 73162453 by 3 and we get 2194873590,

again when we will multiply 73162453 by 4 and we get 29264981200 and

atlast when we will multiply 73162453 by 2 and we get 146324906000.

Therefore, after adding we get 178150573055.

Examples on multiplication

of large numbers:

**3. Multiply 10201 by 132**

**Solution:**

We first arrange the numbers one below the other in columns.

Hence 10201 × 132 = 1346532

**4. Multiply 98357 by 2904**

**Solution:**

We first arrange the numbers one below the other in columns.

Hence 98357 × 2904 = 285628728

Questions and Answers on Multiplication of Whole Numbers:

**I. Multiply the given numbers by expansion method.**

(i) 669023 × 7

(ii) 6652309 × 6

**Answers:**

(i) 4683161

(ii) 39913854

**II. Multiply the given numbers by column method.**

(i) 27613 × 26

(ii) 66924 × 35

(iii) 615028 × 43

(iv) 781145 × 57

(v) 748250 × 69

(vi) 8417129 × 81

**Answers:**

(i) 717938

(ii) 2342340

(iii) 26446204

(iv) 44525265

(v) 51629250

(vi) 681787449

**III. Multiply the following:**

(i) 39176 × 264

(ii) 86542 × 5406

(iii) 789331 × 318

(iv) 96203 × 6815

(v) 845017 × 497

(vi) 55159 × 2000

**Answers:**

(i) 10342464

(ii) 467846052

(iii) 251007258

(iv) 655623445

(v) 419973449

(vi) 110318000