## Multiplication of Two digit numbers Shortcut tricks

### Multiplication of Two digit numbers:

13 x 13 = ?

The result of multiplication of two digit number is 13×13 = 169.

Step 1: Multiply 3×3 = 9 then,

Step 2: Do Cross-multiplication (1×3) = 3 and (1×3) = 3.

Step 3: Add both the result (1×3 + 1×3) = 6 and write down to the left of 9 (result of step 1).

Step 4: Multiply left hand side numbers (1×1) = 1 and write down to the left of 6 (result of step 3).

Finally the result we get 169. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind.)

87 x 33 = ?

The result of multiplication of two digit number is 88 x 33 = 2871

Step 1: Multiply (3×7) = 21 note down 1 and carry 2 then,

Step 2: Do Cross-multiplication (3×8) = 24 and (3×7) = 21.

Step 3: Add both the result with carry (24 + 21 + 2) = 47 and write down 7 carry 4.

Step 4: Multiply left hand side numbers (3×8) = 24 and add carry (24 + 4) write down to the left of 7

Finally the result we get 2871. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind.)

### Another multiplication of Two digit numbers:

17 x 19 = ?

The result of multiplication of two digit number is 17×19 = 323.

Step 1: Multiply 7×9 = 63 (note down 3 and carry over 6).

Step 2: (1×9 + 1×7 + 6 (add carry)) = 22 (note down 2 and carry over 2 for next step).

Step 3: (1×1 + 2) = 3, note it down.

And finally the result we get 323. (Try to calculate all three steps in mind.)

### Another multiplication of Two digit numbers

38 x 27 = ?

The result of multiplication of two digit number is 38 x 27 = 1026

Step 1: Multiply (7×8) = 56 note down 6 and carry 5 then,

Step 2: Do Cross-multiplication (7×3) = 21 and (2×8) = 16.

Step 3: Add both the result with carry (21 + 16 + 6) = 42 and write down 2 carry 4.

Step 4: Multiply left hand side numbers (2×3) = 6 and add carry (6 + 4) write down to the left of 2

Finally the result we get 1026. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind.)

### Another multiplication of Two digit numbers

59 x 42 = ?

The result of multiplication of two digit number is 59 x 42 = 2478

Step 1: Multiply (2×9) = 18 note down 8 and carry 1 then,

Step 2: Do Cross-multiplication (2×5) = 10 and (4×9) = 36.

Step 3: Add both the result with carry (10 + 36 + 1) = 47 and write down 7 carry 4.

Step 4: Multiply left hand side numbers (4×5) = 20 and add carry (20 + 4) write down to the left of 7

Finally the result we get 2478. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind.)