## Multiplication of Three digit numbers Shortcut Tricks

### Multiplication of a Three digit numbers

175 x 157 = ?
The result of multiplication of three digit number is 175×157 = 27475.

Step 1: Multiply (5×7) = 35 (note down 5 carry 3).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication (7×7 + 5×5 + 3 (add carry)) = 77 (note down 7 carry 7).
Step 3: Again (1×7 + 1×5 + 7×5 + 7 (add carry)) = 54 (note down 4 carry 5).
Step 4: do cross multiplication and add carry (1×5 + 1×7 + 5 (add carry)) = 17 (note down 7 carry 1).
Step 5: Again (1×1 + 1) = 2, note it down.
And finally the result we get 27475.

### Another Example of Multiplication of a Three digit numbers

275×354 = ?
The result of multiplication of three digit number is 275×354 = 97350.

Step 1: Multiply (4×5) = 20 (note down 0 carry 2).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication (5×5 + 4×7 + 2 (add carry)) = 55 (note down 5 carry 5).
Step 3: Again (4×2 + 3×5 + 5×7 + 5 (add carry)) = 63 (note down 3 carry 6).
Step 4: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5×2 + 3×7 + 6) = 37 (note down 7 carry 3).
Step 5: do multiplication of left numbers and add carry  (3×2 + 3) = 9, note it down.
And finally the result we get 97350.

### Another Example of Multiplication of a Three digit numbers

395×284 = ?
The result of multiplication of three digit number is 395×284 = 112180.

Step 1: Multiply (4×5) = 20 (note down 0 carry 2).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication(4×9 + 8×5 + 2 (add carry)) = 78 (note down 8 carry 7).
Step 3: Again (4×3 + 2×5 + 8×9 + 7 (add carry)) = 101 (note down 1 carry 10).
Step 4: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (8×3 + 2×9 + 10) = 52 (note down 2 carry 5).
Step 5: do multiplication of left numbers(2×3 + 5) = 11, note it down.

And finally the result we get 112180.