## Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers Shortcut Tricks

### Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers

295 x 19 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 295×19 = 5605.

Step 1: Multiply 5×9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9×9 + 5×1 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
Step 3: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2×9 + 1×9 +9) = 36 (note down 6 and carry 3).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry(2×1 + 3) = 5, note it down.
And finally the result we get 5605.

### Another example of Three and Two digit numbers

195 x 19 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 195 x 19 = 3705.

Step 1: Multiply 5×9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9×9 + 5×1 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
Step 3: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (1×9 + 1×9 +9) = 27 (note down 7 and carry 2).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry  (1×1 + 2) = 3, note it down.
And finally the result we get 3705.

### Another example of Three and Two digit numbers

495 x 29 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 195 x 19 = 14355.

Step 1: Multiply 5×9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9×9 + 5×2 + 4) = 95 (note down 5 and carry 9).
Step 3: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (4×9 + 9×2 +9) = 63 (note down 3 and carry 6).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry(4×2 + 6) = 14, note it down.
And finally the result we get 14355.

### Another example of Three and Two digit numbers

999 x 99 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 195 x 19 = 14355.

Step 1: Multiply 9×9 = 81 (note down 1 and carry 8).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9×9 + 9×9 + 8)=170 (note down 0 and carry 17).
Step 3: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9×9 + 9×9 + 17)=179 (note down 9 and carry 17).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry(9×9 + 17) = 98, note it down.
And finally the result we get 98901.