Multiplication of Four & Two Digit shortcut Tricks

Multiplication of Four & Two Digit shortcut Tricks

Multiplication of Four and Two digit numbers

4295 x 19 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 4295×19 = 81605.

Step 1: Multiply 5×9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (1×9 + 9×9 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
Step 3: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (1×9 + 9×2 +9) = 36 (note down 6 and carry 3).
Step 4: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (9×4 + 1×2 +3) =41 (note down 1 and carry 4).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (1×4 + 4) = 8, note it down.
And finally the result we get 81605.

Multiplication of Four and Two digit numbers

3457 x 23 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 4295×19 = 79511.

Step 1: Multiply 3×7 = 21 (note down 1 and carry 2).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (3×5 + 2×7 + 2) = 31 (note down 1 and carry 3).
Step 3: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2×5 + 3×4 +3) = 25 (note down 5 and carry 2).
Step 4: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2×4 + 3×3 +3) = 19 (note down 9 and carry 1).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (2×3 + 1) = 7 , note it down.
And finally the result we get 79511.

Multiplication of Four and Two digit numbers

5678 x 59 = ?
The result of multiplication of three and two digit number is 5678 x 59 = 335002.

Step 1: Multiply 9×8 = 72 (note down 2 and carry 7).
Step 2: Then do cross multiplication and add carry (5×8 + 9×7 + 7) = 110 (note down 0 and carry 11).
Step 3: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5×7 + 9×6 +11)=100(note down 0 and carry 10).
Step 4: Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5×6 + 9×5 +10) = 85 (note down 5 and carry 8).
Step 4: Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (5×5 + 8) = 33 , note it down.
And finally the result we get 335002.

Leave a Reply