# Multiplication by Ten, Hundred and Thousand

To multiply a number by 10, 100, or 1000 we need to count the

number of zeroes in the multiplier and write the same number of zeroes to the

right of the multiplicand.

Rules for the multiplication by 10, 100 and 1000:

**● **If we multiply a whole number by a 10, then we write

one zero at the end of the multiplicand.

**For example:**

1275 × 10 = 12750

**● **If we multiply a whole number by a 100, then we write

two zeros at the end of the multiplicand.

**For example:**

1275 × 100 = 127500

**● **If we multiply a whole number by a 1000, then we write

three zeros at the end of the multiplicand.

**For example:**

1275 × 1000 = 1275000

**● **To multiply a number by a multiplier having zero and

non-zero part, we put as many zeroes in the product as in the multiplier and

then multiply the number by non-zero part.

**For example:**

1275 × 20 = 25500

1275 × 300 = 382500

1275 × 5000 = 6375000

You can even keep the above chart for further reference.

Questions and Answers on Multiplication by Ten, Hundred and Thousand

**1. Compare the given wheels by writing the product in the outermost circle.**

(i)

**Answers:**

(ii)

**Answers:**

(iii)

**Answers:**

**2. Find the missing multiplicand in each of the following
questions.**

(i) ……………… × 40 = 36000

(ii) ……………… × 500 = 7500000

(iii) ……………… × 700 = 77000000

(iv) ……………… × 9000 = 81000

(v) ……………… × 80000 = 96000000

**Answers:**

(i) 900

(ii) 15000

(iii) 110000

(iv) 9

(v) 1200

**3. Fill in the blanks.**

(i) 17 × 10 = __________

(ii) 68 × __________ = 68000

(iii) 25 × 100 = __________

(iv) 100 × __________ = 22500

(v) 23 × 1000 = __________

(vi) __________ × 10 = 8900

(vii) 24 × 10 = __________

(viii) __________ × 1000 = 40000

(ix) 31 × 100 = __________

(x) __________ × 1000 = 48000

(xi) 78 × 1000 = __________

(xii) __________ × 18 = 18000

(xiii) 16 × __________ = 1600

(xiv) 100 × __________ = 68200

(xv) __________ × 42 = 420

(xvi) __________ × 115 = 11500

(xvii) 723 × __________ = 7230

(xviii) __________ × 1000 = 27000

(xix) __________ × 807 = 8070

(xx) __________ × 100 = 50900

(xxi) 1000 × __________ = 63000

(xxii) 999 × 100 = __________

**Answer:**

(i) 170

(ii) 1000

(iii) 2500

(iv) 225

(v) 23000

(vi) 890

(vii) 240

(viii) 40

(ix) 3100

(x) 48

(xi) 78000

(xii) 1000

(xiii) 100

(xiv) 682

(xv) 10

(xvi) 100

(xvii) 10

(xviii) 27

(xix) 10

(xx) 509

(xxi) 63

(xxii) 99900