## Factorization

Factorization By Factoring number,you can break down problems into simpler multiplication tasks.Also,you may be able to apply some techniques you learned. 21*33 step 1 : 21*11*3 Step 2: 231*3 Step…

## Multiplication Trick

Multiply by 5 1234 *5 =6170 Step 1 : Divide the number by 2 :1234/2=617 Step 2: Multiply the result from Step 1 by 10 : 617*10=6170 Multiply by 25 18*25=450 Step…

## Multiply two digit number by 11

Multiply two digit number by 11 53*11=583 Step 1: Add the both digts of the two digit number:5+3=8 Step 2: Place the result in between both digits : 583 59*11=649…

## Multiply two digits numbers ending in 1

Multiply two digits numbers ending in 1 51*31=1581 Step 1: Multiply the left most digits : 5*3=15 Step 2: Add the left most digits:5+3=8 Step 3: Places the result from…

## Multiply by 125

Multiply by 125 68*125=8500 Step 1 :Place three zeros at the end of the number :68000 Step 2: Divide the number from Step 1 by 8:68000/8=8500 64*125 is the same…